NY A03719 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-10 - signed chap.491
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-10 - signed chap.491
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires museums to post a notice with the display of any art stolen during the Nazi era in Europe.
Title
Requires museums to post a notice with the display of any art stolen during the Nazi era in Europe.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-10 | Assembly | signed chap.491 |
2022-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.669 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S117A |
2022-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.511 |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | reported |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | print number 3719a |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S00117 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3719A