NY A03705 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to persons designated by a general hospital to identify infectious disease processes, conduct surveillance and epidemiologic investigations, and develop plans to prevent and control the transmission of infectious agents within general hospitals.
Title
Relates to persons designated by a general hospital to identify infectious disease processes, conduct surveillance and epidemiologic investigations, and develop plans to prevent and control the transmission of infectious agents within general hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3705b |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.152 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.404 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | print number 3705a |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05186 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5186B