NY A03705 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that antitrust laws shall not apply to any joint agreement entered into, in consultation with and approved by the state racing and wagering board, by or among non-profit associations, thoroughbred racing associations or corporations, harness racing associations or corporations, quarter horse racing associations or corporations and regional off-track betting corporations to coordinate the dates and times under which they will conduct programs of racing and offer pari-mutuel wagering; also provides that such laws shall not apply to agreements entered into to sell, transfer, assign or purchase the rights to broadcast, simulcast, electronically transmit or offer pari-mutuel wagering on horse races.
Title
Provides that antitrust laws shall not apply to any joint agreement entered into, in consultation with and approved by the state racing and wagering board, by or among non-profit associations, thoroughbred racing associations or corporations, harness racing associations or corporations, quarter horse racing associations or corporations and regional off-track betting corporations to coordinate the dates and times under which they will conduct programs of racing and offer pari-mutuel wagering; also provides that such laws shall not apply to agreements entered into to sell, transfer, assign or purchase the rights to broadcast, simulcast, electronically transmit or offer pari-mutuel wagering on horse races.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Senate | tabled |
2011-08-03 | Senate | vetoed memo.27 |
2011-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.165 |
2011-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S623 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.203 |
2011-04-13 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-26 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S00623 (Same As) 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3705