NY A03679 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s3444a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s3444a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Wayne to impose a hotel or motel room or seasonal rental occupancy tax; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Authorizes the county of Wayne to impose a hotel or motel room or seasonal rental occupancy tax; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s3444a |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.496 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.496 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | print number 3679a |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03444 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.325