NY A03638 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing certain persons in an optional twenty year retirement plan for state university police officer service, regional state park police and investigators for the office of the attorney general.
Title
Relates to authorizing certain persons in an optional twenty year retirement plan for state university police officer service, regional state park police and investigators for the office of the attorney general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 3638b |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | print number 3638a |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05109 (Same As) 2022-05-03 - PRINT NUMBER 5109D