NY A03629 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - signed chap.321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - signed chap.321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting the Kenmore-Town of Tonawanda union free school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Relates to permitting the Kenmore-Town of Tonawanda union free school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Senate | signed chap.321 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.564 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1735 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.339 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01735 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - signed chap.321