NY A03574 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - ordered to third reading rules cal.95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - ordered to third reading rules cal.95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a law enforcement officer or peace officer who discharges his or her weapon under circumstances where a person could be struck by a bullet to immediately report the incident to his or her superiors.
Title
Requires a law enforcement officer or peace officer who discharges his or her weapon under circumstances where a person could be struck by a bullet to immediately report the incident to his or her superiors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.95 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.95 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S09133 (Same As) 2018-07-13 - REFERRED TO RULES