NY A03564 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the enforcement of provisions relating to carriers of household goods by motor vehicle; authorizes the attorney general to seek an injunction to enjoin and restrain the continuance or threat of certain violations by such carriers.
Title
Relates to the enforcement of provisions relating to carriers of household goods by motor vehicle; authorizes the attorney general to seek an injunction to enjoin and restrain the continuance or threat of certain violations by such carriers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.148 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.240 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01785 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES