NY A03551 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-05 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to referrals of patients for health related items or services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to referrals of patients for health related items or services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-05Senatetabled
2012-10-03Senatevetoed memo.153
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.814
2012-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4660
2012-05-14SenateRECOMMITTED TO HEALTH
2012-05-14Senatereturned to senate
2012-05-14Assemblyrepassed assembly
2012-05-08Assemblyamended on third reading 3551a
2012-05-08Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2012-05-08AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-05-08Senaterecalled from senate
2012-01-30SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2012-01-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-01-30Assemblypassed assembly
2012-01-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.138
2012-01-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-01-04SenateDIED IN SENATE
2011-02-14SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2011-02-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2011-02-14Assemblypassed assembly
2011-02-10Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.40
2011-02-08Assemblyreported
2011-01-25Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04660 (Same As) 2012-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3551A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03551&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03551&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03551
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03551&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03551A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03551&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03551&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A3551#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback