NY A03549 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the constitution to allow a person who will be 18 years old at the time of a presidential election to vote in the presidential primary election if he or she is 17 years of age at the time of the presidential primary election.
Title
Amends the constitution to allow a person who will be 18 years old at the time of a presidential election to vote in the presidential primary election if he or she is 17 years of age at the time of the presidential primary election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.276 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.201 |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to judiciary |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S03979 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY