NY A03516 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - approval memo.68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - approval memo.68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurers to provide insureds or subscribers with an explanation of pharmaceutical benefits relating to claims under certain accident and health insurance policies.
Title
Requires insurers to provide insureds or subscribers with an explanation of pharmaceutical benefits relating to claims under certain accident and health insurance policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Assembly | approval memo.68 |
2021-12-21 | Assembly | signed chap.678 |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1672 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7075 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.107 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.107 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07075 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3516