NY A03510 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s2089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s2089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to credit union memberships and membership powers; sets forth the qualifications for membership in a credit union; and amends the powers of credit unions in relation to business loans, investment activities and other powers.
Title
Relates to credit union memberships and membership powers; sets forth the qualifications for membership in a credit union; and amends the powers of credit unions in relation to business loans, investment activities and other powers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s2089 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.621 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.621 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S02089 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.275