NY A03487 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to permitting combination last name changes to occur when separated by a space, currently it is only allowed if separated by a hyphen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to permitting combination last name changes to occur when separated by a space, currently it is only allowed if separated by a hyphen.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-28Senate3RD READING CAL.354
2019-03-28SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4622
2019-03-12SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2019-03-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-12Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.110
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S04622 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3487

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback