NY A03477 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - print number 3477b
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - print number 3477b
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a judicial remedy to resolve complaints related to utility bills that have an alleged amount of damages exceeding twenty-five thousand dollars.
Title
Provides a judicial remedy to resolve complaints related to utility bills that have an alleged amount of damages exceeding twenty-five thousand dollars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Assembly | print number 3477b |
2022-04-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-04-01 | Assembly | print number 3477a |
2021-04-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04322 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 4322B