NY A03410 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-04 - print number 3410b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-04 - print number 3410b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recodifies the small business innovation research program within the New York state urban development corporation act; alters provisions under the small business innovation research program particularly as they affect Phase I award winners; prohibits arbitrary exclusion of technologies and companies; provides for matching of federal funds, to a certain extent.
Title
Recodifies the small business innovation research program within the New York state urban development corporation act; alters provisions under the small business innovation research program particularly as they affect Phase I award winners; prohibits arbitrary exclusion of technologies and companies; provides for matching of federal funds, to a certain extent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-04 | Assembly | print number 3410b |
2012-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-03-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to small business |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | print number 3410a |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to small business |
2011-01-25 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S03394 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
S07257 (Same As) 2012-05-02 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
S07257 (Same As) 2012-05-02 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS