NY A03375 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - print number 3375a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - print number 3375a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the handling fee paid by a deposit initiator to a dealer or operator of a redemption center from three and one half cents to five cents per container; decreases the amount of quarterly payments a deposit initiator must pay the commissioner of taxation and finance from eighty to forty-seven percent of the balance of initiator's refund value account; provides for registration as a redemption center.
Title
Increases the handling fee paid by a deposit initiator to a dealer or operator of a redemption center from three and one half cents to five cents per container; decreases the amount of quarterly payments a deposit initiator must pay the commissioner of taxation and finance from eighty to forty-seven percent of the balance of initiator's refund value account; provides for registration as a redemption center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Assembly | print number 3375a |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07428 (Same As) 2024-05-10 - PRINT NUMBER 7428A