NY A03309 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the warehouse worker injury reduction program; requires employers to establish an injury reduction program designed to identify and minimize the risks of musculoskeletal injuries and disorders among workers involved in performing manual materials handling tasks.
Title
Establishes the warehouse worker injury reduction program; requires employers to establish an injury reduction program designed to identify and minimize the risks of musculoskeletal injuries and disorders among workers involved in performing manual materials handling tasks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | print number 3309a |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05081 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE