NY S05081 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the warehouse worker injury reduction program; requires employers to establish an injury reduction program designed to identify and minimize the risks of musculoskeletal injuries and disorders among workers involved in performing manual materials handling tasks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the warehouse worker injury reduction program; requires employers to establish an injury reduction program designed to identify and minimize the risks of musculoskeletal injuries and disorders among workers involved in performing manual materials handling tasks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2024-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.401
2024-06-07Assemblysubstituted for a8907a
2024-06-05Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2024-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-28SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1473
2024-05-28SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 5081C
2024-05-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2024-02-27SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 5081B
2024-01-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-06Assemblyreferred to labor
2023-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1640
2023-06-06SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 5081A
2023-05-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2023-02-22SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A08907 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s5081c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5081
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05081&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05081
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05081&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05081A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05081&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05081B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05081&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05081C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5081#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5081#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5081#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5081#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5081#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05081&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback