NY A03295 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the duties of skiers and ski area operators regarding the use of helmets; requires skiers under age 14 to wear helmets; requires ski area operators to maintain an adequate supply of helmets for sale and rental; requires operators to post signs.
Title
Relates to the duties of skiers and ski area operators regarding the use of helmets; requires skiers under age 14 to wear helmets; requires ski area operators to maintain an adequate supply of helmets for sale and rental; requires operators to post signs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2011-04-14 | Assembly | print number 3295a |
2011-04-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2011-01-24 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04356 (Same As) 2012-01-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE