NY A03241 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - approval memo.39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - approval memo.39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to special proceedings by tenants of dwellings outside the city of New York and certain counties for judgment directing deposit of rents and the use thereof for the purpose of remedying conditions dangerous to life, health or safety.
Title
Relates to special proceedings by tenants of dwellings outside the city of New York and certain counties for judgment directing deposit of rents and the use thereof for the purpose of remedying conditions dangerous to life, health or safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-15 | Assembly | approval memo.39 |
2022-12-15 | Assembly | signed chap.677 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.705 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6721 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.120 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.425 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.425 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06721 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3241