NY S06721 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to special proceedings by tenants of dwellings outside the city of New York and certain counties for judgment directing deposit of rents and the use thereof for the purpose of remedying conditions dangerous to life, health or safety.
Title
Relates to special proceedings by tenants of dwellings outside the city of New York and certain counties for judgment directing deposit of rents and the use thereof for the purpose of remedying conditions dangerous to life, health or safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3241 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.705 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A03241 (Same As) 2022-12-15 - approval memo.39