NY A03208 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a portion of the local hotel occupancy tax in a city having a population of one million or more shall be dedicated to promoting tourism within each individual borough of such city.
Title
Provides that a portion of the local hotel occupancy tax in a city having a population of one million or more shall be dedicated to promoting tourism within each individual borough of such city.
Sponsors
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00479 (Same As) 2018-02-27 - referred to ways and means