NY A03178 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - signed chap.344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - signed chap.344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain information to be included on labeling of fish by fish wholesalers.
Title
Requires certain information to be included on labeling of fish by fish wholesalers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.344 |
2017-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1044 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1422 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.530 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.530 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S01422 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3178