NY S01422 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain information to be included on labeling of fish by fish wholesalers.
Title
Requires certain information to be included on labeling of fish by fish wholesalers.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3178 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1044 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A03178 (Same As) 2017-10-23 - signed chap.344