NY A03177 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the offense of operating a motor vehicle with a suspended driver's license may be enforceable for operating a motor vehicle in a parking lot; defines the term "parking lot" as any area or areas of private property, including a driveway, near or contiguous to and provided in connection with premises and used as a means of access to and egress from a public highway to such premises and having a capacity for the parking of four or more motor vehicles; excludes parking areas for one and two family residences.
Title
Provides that the offense of operating a motor vehicle with a suspended driver's license may be enforceable for operating a motor vehicle in a parking lot; defines the term "parking lot" as any area or areas of private property, including a driveway, near or contiguous to and provided in connection with premises and used as a means of access to and egress from a public highway to such premises and having a capacity for the parking of four or more motor vehicles; excludes parking areas for one and two family residences.
Sponsors
Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Joseph Borelli [R] | Asm. Michelle Schimel [D] |
Asm. Samuel Roberts [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01506 (Same As) 2014-05-07 - referred to codes