NY A03152 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - signed chap.508
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - signed chap.508
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the membership of the Orange county water authority from five to seven members.
Title
Increases the membership of the Orange county water authority from five to seven members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.508 |
2011-09-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1017 |
2011-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5437 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.98 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.98 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-01-24 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05437 (Same As) 2011-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3152