NY A03145 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the provision of care to persons requiring twenty-four hours of care take the form of non-sequential split shifts of twelve hours each.
Title
Requires the provision of care to persons requiring twenty-four hours of care take the form of non-sequential split shifts of twelve hours each.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | print number 3145a |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S00359 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 359A