NY A03127 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to contracts for transportation of children; requires that in New York city that the board of education or the city school district awards a contract or contracts for transportation pursuant to an evaluation of proposals submitted in response to a request for proposals, there shall be employee protection provisions rationally relating to the promotion of a pool of qualified workers and the avoidance of labor disputes; makes related provisions.
Title
Relates to contracts for transportation of children; requires that in New York city that the board of education or the city school district awards a contract or contracts for transportation pursuant to an evaluation of proposals submitted in response to a request for proposals, there shall be employee protection provisions rationally relating to the promotion of a pool of qualified workers and the avoidance of labor disputes; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Senate | tabled |
2011-09-23 | Senate | vetoed memo.54 |
2011-09-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1417 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1368A |
2011-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.211 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.211 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-02 | Assembly | print number 3127a |
2011-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2011-04-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-01-24 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01368 (Same As) 2011-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3127A