NY A03121 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - advanced to third reading cal.582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - advanced to third reading cal.582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to limits on certain supplementary insurance.
Title
Relates to limits on certain supplementary insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.582 |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.246 |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S04674 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE