NY A03080 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Restricts the use of segregated confinement and creates alternative therapeutic and rehabilitative confinement options; limits the length of time a person may be in segregated confinement and excludes certain persons from being placed in segregated confinement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricts the use of segregated confinement and creates alternative therapeutic and rehabilitative confinement options; limits the length of time a person may be in segregated confinement and excludes certain persons from being placed in segregated confinement.

Sponsors

Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]
Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]
Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Frank Skartados [D]
Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]
Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Matthew Titone [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]
Asm. Addie Jenne [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Michele Titus [D]
Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Sen. Shelley Mayer [D]
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]
Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Christine Pellegrino [D]Asm. Rafael Espinal [D]
Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. William Magee [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]

Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-10Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.861
2018-05-08Assemblyreported
2018-03-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-02-27Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-02-12Assemblyprint number 3080b
2018-02-12Assemblyamend and recommit to correction
2018-02-08Assemblyprint number 3080a
2018-02-08Assemblyamend and recommit to correction
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to correction
2017-01-26Assemblyreferred to correction

Same As/Similar To

S03824 (Same As) 2017-02-28 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04784 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - PRINT NUMBER 4784A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03080&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03080&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03080
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03080&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03080A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03080&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03080B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03080&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03080&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03080&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03080&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback