NY A03042 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric companies to provide alternative measures to ensure customers with documented need for essential electricity for medical needs have access to electricity during power outages; requires electric companies to provide generators or lodging for such individuals and transportation for medical devices.
Title
Requires electric companies to provide alternative measures to ensure customers with documented need for essential electricity for medical needs have access to electricity during power outages; requires electric companies to provide generators or lodging for such individuals and transportation for medical devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-11-19 | Assembly | print number 3042a |
2021-11-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S00928 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES