NY A03037 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any bill which provides revenue to the state in a non-recurring manner shall pass by a two-thirds majority in order to become law.
Title
Requires that any bill which provides revenue to the state in a non-recurring manner shall pass by a two-thirds majority in order to become law.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Ra [R] | Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] |
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Christopher Tague [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00909 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY