NY A02969 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the requiring of CPR certification and Heimlich maneuver training among teachers and lunch monitors in school cafeterias.
Title
Relates to the requiring of CPR certification and Heimlich maneuver training among teachers and lunch monitors in school cafeterias.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Curran [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Ron Castorina [R] | Asm. Joseph Errigo [R] |
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | print number 2969a |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to education |