NY A02945 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - print number 2945a
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - print number 2945a
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount combat veterans shall be exempt from real property taxation to thirty-five percent.
Title
Increases the amount combat veterans shall be exempt from real property taxation to thirty-five percent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | Assembly | print number 2945a |
2016-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S03836 (Same As) 2016-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 3836A