NY A02881 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - substituted by s2420b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - substituted by s2420b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of eligible securities in relation to obligations of domestic corporations.
Title
Relates to the definition of eligible securities in relation to obligations of domestic corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | substituted by s2420b |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.92 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | print number 2881b |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to banks |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | print number 2881a |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to banks |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S02420 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.424