NY A02833 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs that state agencies require that procurement of personal computing goods, services and solutions meet the National Institute of Standards and Technology (NIST) Cybersecurity Framework.
Title
Directs that state agencies require that procurement of personal computing goods, services and solutions meet the National Institute of Standards and Technology (NIST) Cybersecurity Framework.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Science And Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Science And Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | referred to science and technology |
Same As/Similar To
S05615 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS