NY A02806 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state to allow counties to opt out of the county cost of medical assistance payments to any new enrollees who have either never received such benefits or who have reenrolled after a period of absence; further directs the commissioner of health to apply for any and all federal waivers required to implement the provisions of this subdivision.
Title
Authorizes the state to allow counties to opt out of the county cost of medical assistance payments to any new enrollees who have either never received such benefits or who have reenrolled after a period of absence; further directs the commissioner of health to apply for any and all federal waivers required to implement the provisions of this subdivision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Assembly | held for consideration in health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-01-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08798 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - REFERRED TO RULES