NY A02755 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the governor and senior state officers to appear before the legislature as requested by the legislature to publicly explain actions and answer questions.
Title
Requires the governor and senior state officers to appear before the legislature as requested by the legislature to publicly explain actions and answer questions.
Sponsors
Asm. Jarett Gandolfo [R] | Asm. Josh Jensen [R] | Asm. Edward Ra [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] |
Asm. Michael Durso [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2023-01-30 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |