NY A02753 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s6698a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s6698a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Bais Tefila of Inwood to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes the Bais Tefila of Inwood to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Asm. Eric Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6698a |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2753a |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2023-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.143 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.143 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06698 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.455