NY A02753 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires reimbursement for surgical first assistant services.
Title
Requires reimbursement for surgical first assistant services.
Sponsors
Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Joseph Morelle [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Raymond Walter [R] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D] | Asm. Jane Corwin [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.536 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.536 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | print number 2753a |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-17 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03056 (Same As) 2014-05-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE