NY A02743 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to violations of safety in adult care facilities.
Title
Relates to violations of safety in adult care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.218 |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.395 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to health |