NY A02723 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-23 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-23 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To require HESC to respond within a certain time period re student awards
Title
An act to amend the education law, in relation to general and academic performance awards, student loans and tuition assistance program awards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | |
2010-02-23 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-23 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.228 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-05-04 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | |
2009-05-04 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-04 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-30 | advanced to third reading cal.443 | |
2009-04-28 | reported | |
2009-03-03 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-21 | referred to higher education |