NY A02686 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - substituted by s2450a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends provisions relating to requirements for the safe storage of rifles, shotguns and firearms; requires sellers to provide notice of the duty to use gun locking devices and otherwise lock guns away from children and other persons not authorized to possess them.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends provisions relating to requirements for the safe storage of rifles, shotguns and firearms; requires sellers to provide notice of the duty to use gun locking devices and otherwise lock guns away from children and other persons not authorized to possess them.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04Assemblysubstituted by s2450a
2019-02-28Assemblyamended on third reading 2686a
2019-01-28Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.23
2019-01-28Assemblyrules report cal.23
2019-01-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-28Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-24Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02450 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback