NY S02450 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - SIGNED CHAP.135
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends provisions relating to requirements for the safe storage of rifles, shotguns and firearms; requires sellers to provide notice of the duty to use gun locking devices and otherwise lock guns away from children and other persons not authorized to possess them.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends provisions relating to requirements for the safe storage of rifles, shotguns and firearms; requires sellers to provide notice of the duty to use gun locking devices and otherwise lock guns away from children and other persons not authorized to possess them.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30AssemblySIGNED CHAP.135
2019-07-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-03-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-03-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-04Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.23
2019-03-04Assemblysubstituted for a2686a
2019-03-04Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-03-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-28SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2450A
2019-01-28SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.94
2019-01-28SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A02686 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - substituted by s2450a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02450&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02450&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02450
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02450&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02450A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2450#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2450#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2450#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02450&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback