NY A02677 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a state transportation plan; requires such plan include a minimum twenty-year forecast period at the time of adoption, assessing long-range needs spanning such period, including a forecast of highway pavement and bridge conditions.
Title
Relates to a state transportation plan; requires such plan include a minimum twenty-year forecast period at the time of adoption, assessing long-range needs spanning such period, including a forecast of highway pavement and bridge conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.76 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.193 |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.193 |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | print number 2677a |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06154 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION