NY A02655 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - substituted by s3392
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the uniform treatment of waste from the exploration, development, extraction, or production of crude oil or natural gas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the uniform treatment of waste from the exploration, development, extraction, or production of crude oil or natural gas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted by s3392
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.248
2019-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.248
2019-06-13Assemblyreported
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-24Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S03392 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - ordered to third reading rules cal.248

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback