NY A02624 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-07 - ordered to third reading rules cal.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-07 - ordered to third reading rules cal.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the posting of notice by certain establishments upon the submission of an application or application for renewal for a liquor license to sell liquor.
Title
An act to amend the alcoholic beverage control law, in relation to procedures associated with issuing licenses to sell liquor for consumption
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Herman Farrell [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Joan Millman [D] | Asm. Audrey Pheffer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | ordered to third reading rules cal.64 | |
2010-06-07 | rules report cal.64 | |
2010-06-07 | reported | |
2010-06-03 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-18 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-01-06 | referred to economic development | |
2009-01-21 | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S4141 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS