NY A02600 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-23 - signed chap.430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-23 - signed chap.430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to severely or repeatedly abused children in child protective and parental termination proceedings.
Title
Relates to severely or repeatedly abused children in child protective and parental termination proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.430 |
2013-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.361 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4082 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.139 |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-16 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S04082 (Same As) 2013-05-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2600