NY A02591 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - signed chap.724
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - signed chap.724
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to provisions in state procurement contracts involving the use of low embodied carbon concrete.
Title
Relates to provisions in state procurement contracts involving the use of low embodied carbon concrete.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.724 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.775 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S542A |
2021-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.538 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.538 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 2591a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00542 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2591A