NY A02585 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if it appears that a death may have resulted from the commission of a crime, the coroner or medical examiner in any county with geographic jurisdiction over the crime shall have concurrent jurisdiction and authority to investigate the death.
Title
Provides that if it appears that a death may have resulted from the commission of a crime, the coroner or medical examiner in any county with geographic jurisdiction over the crime shall have concurrent jurisdiction and authority to investigate the death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.206 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.50 |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.50 |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |